HI SB2181 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to LBR/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to LBR/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Improves access for firefighters to comprehensive medical benefits upon diagnosis of cancer that is presumed to arise out of and in the course of employment.
Title
Relating To Workers' Compensation Medical Benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to LBR/CPH, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1778 (Same As) 2018-07-06 - Act 107, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1208).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2181&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2181_.HTM |