HI HB1778 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-06 - Act 107, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1208).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-06 - Act 107, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1208).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Improves access for firefighters to comprehensive medical benefits under the Workers' Compensation Law upon diagnosis of cancer that is presumed to arise out of and in the course of employment. Requires private health care plans to pay for or provide medical care, services, and supplies to injured employees for controverted workers' compensation claims that are accepted or determined to be compensable. (HB1778 CD1)
Title
Relating To Workers' Compensation Medical Benefits.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-06 | Senate | Act 107, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1208). |
2018-07-06 | House | Act 107, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1208). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 149-18). |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 149-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Baker, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Takumi, Holt, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-24-18 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 804). |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Baker, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Takumi, Holt Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 609) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3532) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-18 10:50AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from LBR/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3207) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, S. Chang, Ihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR deferred the measure until 03-22-18 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 03-22-18 9:15AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to LBR/CPH, WAM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 52). |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 828-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole, Tupola. |
2018-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-21-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-13 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-13 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 338-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Tokioka, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Say, McDermott. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-07-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-31 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Ward excused (2). |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 21-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-01-25 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2018-01-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 01-25-18 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2181 (Same As) 2018-01-22 - Referred to LBR/CPH, WAM.