HI SB2175 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the month of February as "Olelo Hawaii Month" to celebrate and encourage the use of Hawaiian language. Requires that all letterheads, documents, symbols, and emblems of the State and other political subdivisions include accurate and appropriate Hawaiian names and language. Establishes references for accurate, appropriate, and authentic Hawaiian names and words, including proper Hawaiian spelling and punctuation. (SD1)
Title
Hawaiian Language; Month; February; Public Documents; Letterhead; Symbols
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1031-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, C. Lee, Jordan, Morikawa, Wooley, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno, Yamane, Pine. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 03-14-12 8:45AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to HAW, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 92) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from HWN/EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2522) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ryan, English, Kahele, Kidani, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Hee, Slom. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN/EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Referred to HWN/EDT. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1984 (Same As) 2012-07-10 - (S) Vetoed on 07-10-12 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1392).