HI HB1984 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Vetoed on 07-10-12 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1392).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the month of February as "Olelo Hawaii Month" to celebrate and encourage the use of Hawaiian language. Requires that all letterheads, documents, symbols, and emblems of the State and other political subdivisions include accurate and appropriate Hawaiian names and language. Establishes references for accurate, appropriate, and authentic Hawaiian names and words, including proper Hawaiian spelling and punctuation. (HB1984 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hawaiian Language; Month; February; Public Documents; Letterhead; Symbols

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-10 (S) Vetoed on 07-10-12 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1392).
2012-07-10 (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1392).
2012-06-25 (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-25-12 (Gov. Msg. No. 1253)
2012-06-25 (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1253)
2012-05-07 (H) Transmitted to Governor.
2012-05-02 (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 720).
2012-05-01 (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 831).
2012-05-01 (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2012-05-01 (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ching excused (1).
2012-04-26 (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-12.
2012-04-26 (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 32-12).
2012-04-26 (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-12.
2012-04-26 (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 32-12) as amended in (CD 1).
2012-04-25 (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Fukunaga, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2012-04-25 (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, McKelvey, Awana; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
2012-04-23 (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-12 9:00AM in conference room 312.
2012-04-19 (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-12 9:00AM in conference room 312.
2012-04-17 (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 612).
2012-04-16 (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 753).
2012-04-16 (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Galuteria, Chair; Fukunaga, English, Co-Chair(s); Slom.
2012-04-16 (H) House conferees appointed: Hanohano, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Awana, Ward.
2012-04-16 (H) Re-referred to HAW, ERB, referral sheet 65
2012-04-04 (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 354).
2012-04-03 (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2012-04-02 (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 453) in amended form (SD 1).
2012-04-02 (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Shimabukuro, Solomon). Transmitted to House.
2012-03-30 (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-02-12.
2012-03-30 (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2012-03-30 (S) Reported from HWN/EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3063) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2012-03-21 (S) The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Ryan, English, Kahele, Kidani, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Slom.
2012-03-21 (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Baker, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Slom.
2012-03-16 (S) The committee(s) on HWN/EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-12 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2012-03-08 (S) Referred to HWN/EDT.
2012-03-06 (S) Passed First Reading.
2012-03-06 (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 32).
2012-03-02 (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2012-03-02 (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 01-30-12
2012-03-01 (H) Re-referred to HAW, referral sheet 38
2012-01-30 (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Luke excused (3).
2012-01-30 (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 8-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2012-01-25 (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Hanohano, C. Lee, Belatti, Mizuno, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Jordan.
2012-01-20 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 01-25-12 9:15AM in House conference room 329.
2012-01-19 (H) Referred to HAW, FIN, referral sheet 2
2012-01-18 (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading.
2012-01-17 (H) Prefiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2175 (Same As) 2012-03-16 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4).

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback