HI SB2174 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-23 - Re-Referred to ENE/TIA/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-23 - Re-Referred to ENE/TIA/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of health to adopt rules, no later than 6/30/2015, to establish emissions standards for motor vehicles that achieve the maximum feasible and cost-effective reduction in greenhouse gas emissions and to the greatest extent possible are equivalent to California's most recent administrative regulations for motor vehicle greenhouse gas emissions.
Title
Air Pollution; Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-23 | Senate | Re-Referred to ENE/TIA/PSM, WAM. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Referred to ENE/TIA/PSM. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2174&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB2174_.HTM |