HI SB2173 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the director of commerce and consumer affairs to adopt rules by 7/31/13, for any disinterment of human burials that is done for the purpose of removing the dedication of a cemetery.
Title
Cemeteries; Office of Hawaiian Affairs Package
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-13 | (S) The committee on CPN has rescheduled its decision making to 02-22-12 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-21-12 9:15AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-09-12 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Referred to CPN. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1982 (Same As) 2012-01-19 - (H) Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2173 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2173_.HTM |