HI SB2150 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Act 026, 06/07/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1126).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates supplemental funds for the operating and capital improvement costs of the Judiciary for the fiscal biennium beginning 7/1/2017, and ending 6/30/2019. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Judiciary.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13SenateAct 026, 06/07/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1126).
2018-06-13HouseAct 026, on 06/07/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1126).
2018-05-03SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2018-05-03SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705).
2018-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849).
2018-05-01SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2018-05-01HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2018-04-27HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-18.
2018-04-27HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 98-18) as amended in (CD 1).
2018-04-27Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18.
2018-04-27SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 98-18).
2018-04-27HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Luke, Cullen, San Buenaventura, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-04-27SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Dela Cruz, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 1:30PM in conference room 329.
2018-04-23SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-18 2:00PM in conference room 329.
2018-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 794).
2018-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; K. Rhoads.
2018-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
2018-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen, San Buenaventura, Thielen.
2018-04-06HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 574).
2018-04-06SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2018-04-06SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 450).
2018-04-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Holt, C. Lee, LoPresti, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (6). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1863-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2018-03-28HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
2018-03-24HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
2018-03-23HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
2018-03-23HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1401-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2018-03-21HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, C. Lee, McDermott.
2018-03-19HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-21-18 2:15PM in House conference room 325.
2018-03-08HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 35
2018-03-08HousePass First Reading
2018-03-06HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 107) in amended form (SD 2).
2018-03-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2018-03-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
2018-03-02SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2743) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2018-02-23SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai.
2018-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 9:50AM in conference room 211.
2018-02-20SenateThe committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 02-22-18 10:05AM in conference room 211.
2018-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-18 10:05AM in conference room 211.
2018-02-16SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2018-02-16SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2451) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2018-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-02-09SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-18 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2018-01-22SenateReferred to JDC, WAM.
2018-01-19SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-01-19SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1666 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback