HI SB2146 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a task force to determine whether chapters 127 and 128, Hawaii Revised Statutes, should be amended, repealed, or supplemented to ensure that preparations of this State are adequate in reducing vulnerability to, and recovering from, emergencies and disasters. Report to the legislature.
Title
Emergency Management; Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-12 3:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Referred to PGM, WAM. | |
2012-01-19 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-19 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2146 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2146_.HTM |