HI SB2143 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 684).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 684).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Wildfire Management Branch of the Department of Land and Natural Resources' Division of Forestry and Wildlife to provide nonprofit organizations with grants for wildfire preparedness and mitigation programming. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Land And Natural Resources.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 684). |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Wakai, Hashimoto Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2024-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 489). |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 553). |
2024-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Souza excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1769-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-03-28 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Aiu, Cochran, Lamosao. |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-24 3:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Gates, Martinez, Quinlan excused (5). |
2024-03-15 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1123-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-03-12 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2024-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-12-24 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 77) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2780) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-24 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Reported from WTL/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2251) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to WTL/PSM, WAM. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |