HI SB2142 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the class C offense of endangering public transportation for tampering with a public highway or a facility of public transportation with intent to cause any damage, malfunction, nonfunction, theft, or unauthorized removal of material which would result in the creation of a substantial risk of death or serious bodily injury to another person. Defines facility of public transportation. (SD1)
Title
Endangering Public Transportation; Public Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2462) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Chun Oakland, English, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Slom. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE deferred the measure until 02-17-16 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-16 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Referred to TRE, JDL. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |