HI SB2138 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation for a nutrient cycling center pilot project on Maui. Requires DOA to report on the efficacy of the pilot project.
Title
Appropriation; Agriculture; Nutrient Cycling Center Pilot Project ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2040) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-16 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Referred to WLA, WAM. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2586 (Same As) 2016-02-11 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2138&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2138_.HTM |