HI SB2138 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Act 023, 4/17/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1123).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Act 023, 4/17/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1123).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Aligns the definitions of "neighborhood electric vehicle" in sections 286-2 and 291C-1, HRS, for consistency, and increases the maximum weight rating requirement in both definitions to 3,000 pounds. (SD1)
Title
Neighborhood Electric Vehicles; Definition; Passenger Capacity; Weight Rating
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] |
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Ronald Kouchi [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Senate | Act 023, 4/17/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1123). |
2014-04-22 | House | Act 023, on 4/17/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1123). |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 433). |
2014-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-02 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Hashem, Wooley excused (3). |
2014-04-02 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1385-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-03-17 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Takayama, Aquino, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ing. |
2014-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 03-17-14 10:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to TRN, referral sheet 23 |
2014-02-13 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-02-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 16) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-12-14. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Reported from TIA/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2143) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Green. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-14 1:16PM in conference room 224. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Referred to TIA/PSM. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Introduced. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1649 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - Referred to TRN, referral sheet 2