HI SB2136 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-09 - Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 37
Pending: House Ocean, Marine Resources, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-09 - Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 37
Pending: House Ocean, Marine Resources, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a committee within the Department of Budget and Finance to recommend the annual amount of the income and proceeds from the public land trust that the Office of Hawaiian Affairs shall receive annually. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD3)
Title
Relating To Increasing The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs' Pro Rata Share Of Public Land Trust Funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | House | Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 37 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 426) in amended form (SD 3). |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-18. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report filed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Separated Committee Report. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 3). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 6 offered. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2887) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-28-18 11:15AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 02-22-18 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-18 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from HWN/WTL/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2492) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, English, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, L. Thielen. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, L. Thielen. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/WTL/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-06-18 2:15PM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/WTL/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-18 1:45PM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HWN/WTL/JDC, WAM. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1747 (Same As) 2018-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).