HI SB2108 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Human Services to provide a tiered level of health care premium assistance for individuals depending on their family's income as compared to the federal poverty level. (SB2108 HD1)
Title
Relating To Health Care Assistance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1323-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Say, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno. |
2018-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-21-18 2:15PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Har, Hashem, Lowen, McDermott, Nakashima, Souki excused (7). |
2018-03-15 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1147-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-03-13 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Tuesday, 03-13-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 96) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2823) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reported from HMS/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2121) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Ihara, Ruderman. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-18 2:55PM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |