HI SB2104 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that a person operating electric powered vehicles designed to travel on three wheels in contact with the ground, steered with handlebars, and that meets certain conditions has a driver's license. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Transportation.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2823) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to TRS/EET, JDC. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |