HI SB2101 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the excise tax rate on large cigars. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 41 |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-02-28 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-02-27 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 25) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Fevella, Harimoto). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-27-20. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2898) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 6 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Fevella. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-13-20 10:55AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-20 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |