HI SB2101 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes small claims division's exclusive jurisdiction of cases for amounts of $1,000 or less. Allows plaintiff to request removal of small claims cases to be heard in ordinary procedures of the district court when counterclaim is filed. Allows a plaintiff to file cases in either the small claims division or regular claims division of district court if the plaintiff is represented by an attorney. Prohibits the award of attorney's fees in cases for amounts of $1,000 or less exclusive of interests and costs if the plaintiff is represented by an attorney and the district court has concurrent jurisdiction with the small claims division of district court. Takes effect 1/1/2017. (SD1)
Title
Judiciary Package; District Court; Small Claims Division; Jurisdiction; Attorney's Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 100) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Deferred until 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2651) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-16 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from JDL/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2391) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ruderman. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-16 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Referred to JDL/CPH, WAM. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1648 (Same As) 2016-01-25 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1