HI SB210 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits assessment of a fee for registration of a bicycle or moped that is gifted within 90 days of issuance of the original certificate of registration. Effective 7/1/50. (SD1)
Title
Bicycles and Mopeds; Registration
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 93) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 756) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 95) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-13 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |