HI SB2098 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (H) Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (H) Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that use, disclosure, or authorization for release of individually identifiable health information that complies with federal law shall be deemed to comply with state law. Provides that notice of breach of unsecured protected health information that complies with federal law shall be deemed to comply with state law. (SD1)
Title
Privacy of Health Care Information; HIPAA
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 70) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2573) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. | |
2012-02-21 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-12 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2184) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Baker, Chun Oakland, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom. | |
2012-01-24 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-12 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Referred to HTH, JDL. | |
2012-01-19 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-19 | (S) Introduced. |