HI SB2097 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a task force to study the regulation of motor carriers in the State. Requires a report to the Legislature. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Motor Carriers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2456) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 02-06-24 3:05PM; Conference Room 224. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to TCA, CPN. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1681 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1