HI SB2097 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 35
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 35
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes child abuse and neglect reports for incidents confirmed by the Department of Human Services that occur in group child care homes or group child care centers to be disclosed to parents or guardians of children enrolled in the home or center at the time of the alleged abuse or neglect or to parents or guardians who have applied or requested to enroll their children in the home or center. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Child Safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 94) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2758) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2263) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-18 3:45PM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDC. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1650 (Same As) 2018-07-11 - Act 176, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1285).