HI SB2083 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the formula for the amount of transient accommodations tax to be collected from time shares by increasing the base on which time share occupancy is taxed from 1/2 of the gross daily maintenance fees paid by the owner and attributable to the time share unit to an amount equal to all of those fees. Effective 1/1/2021.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-20 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2083&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2083_.HTM |