HI SB2075 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 681).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 681).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys for three positions and operating expenses of the Sustainable and Organic Agriculture Program administered by the UH College of Tropical Agriculture and Human Resources. (SB2075 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Sustainable And Organic Agriculture Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 681). |
2018-04-26 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 9:00AM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 9:00AM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-18 10:30AM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; Gabbard, Riviere Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Cullen Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2018-04-06 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 574). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 449). |
2018-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Holt, C. Lee, LoPresti, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1856-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1438-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Kong, Learmont, Ohno, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Ing, Onishi, Quinlan. |
2018-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-20-18 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2018-03-15 | House | The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-18 at 2:00 PM. |
2018-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-15-18 2:10PM in conference room 309. |
2018-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-15-18. |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-13-18 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 84) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2872) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reported from HRE/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2148) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kim, S. Chang, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-18 1:18PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HRE/AEN, WAM. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
CTAHR Sustainable and Organic Agriculture Program
Operating Expenses
Position Funding
CTAHR Sustainable and Organic Agriculture Program
Operating Expenses
Position Funding