HI SB2074 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - The committee(s) on WTL/AEN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-16-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - The committee(s) on WTL/AEN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-16-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to designate the Nuuanu Reservoir Number Four as a state recreation area. Requires the Hawaii Invasive Species Council to amend administrative rules regarding the movement of invasive species to allow the stocking of certain fish in the Nuuanu Reservoir Number Four for recreational fishing. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Recreational Aquaculture.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-16-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Hawaii Invasive Species Council
Nuuanu Reservoir Number Four
Recreational Fishing
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Hawaii Invasive Species Council
Nuuanu Reservoir Number Four
Recreational Fishing
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2074&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2074_.HTM |