HI SB2066 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes another means for a housing project to seek an exemption from laws and rules of the State that are developed under various programs of the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24. |
2024-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 35-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 35-24). |
2024-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Tarnas, Ganaden, Takayama, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-24 11:00AM; Conference Room 224. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-24 11:00AM; CR 224. |
2024-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 678). |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Chang Chair; Elefante Co-Chair; Kanuha. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 737). |
2024-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Evslin, Tarnas Co-Chairs; Ganaden, Takayama, Matsumoto. |
2024-04-04 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 366). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 517). |
2024-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Amato, Hussey-Burdick, Poepoe voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-03-24. |
2024-04-01 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1592-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-03-27 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ichiyama, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden, Holt, Ilagan. |
2024-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-27-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Amato, Hussey-Burdick, Kapela, Perruso, Poepoe voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3). |
2024-03-22 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1320-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2024-03-20 | House | The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kila, Miyake, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Onishi. |
2024-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-24 10:00AM. |
2024-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 03-13-24 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to HSG, JHA, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 63) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2929) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2143) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Aquino, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU, JDC. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to HOU, JDC/WAM. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1765 (Same As) 2024-02-09 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.