HI HB1765 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-09 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-09 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain projects meeting the criteria of section 201H-38(a)(1), Hawaii Revised Statutes, to be exclusively for sale or rent to occupants who are Hawaii residents who own no other real property.
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Luke Evslin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Friday, 02-09-24 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to HSG, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2066 (Same As) 2024-05-29 - Act 038, 05/28/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1138).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1765&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1765_.HTM |