HI SB2062 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the proposed drilling, construction, or use of a well on lands leased from the Department of Agriculture from the requirements of the environmental impact statements law, provided that the land is being used to support agriculture and food production.
Title
Relating To Environmental Impact Statements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2387) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL deferred the measure until 01-31-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-22 2:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL, JDC. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |