HI SB2056 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Referred to EDU/HRE, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Referred to EDU/HRE, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes amendments to the Hawaii State Constitution to increase funding for public education for the children and adults of Hawaii by authorizing the Legislature to establish, as provided by law, a surcharge on residential investment property valued at $3,000,000 or greater.
Title
Proposing Amendments To Articles Viii And X Of The Constitution Of The State Of Hawaii To Authorize The Legislature To Establish A Surcharge On Residential Investment Property To Increase Funding For Public Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to EDU/HRE, JDC/WAM. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1537 (Same As) 2024-02-14 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kong, Pierick, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2056&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2056_.HTM |