HI HB1537 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kong, Pierick, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kong, Pierick, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes amendments to the Hawaii State Constitution to repeal the counties exclusive power to tax real property and authorize the Legislature to establish a state surcharge on real property taxation levied by the counties on certain residential investment properties for the purpose of helping to fund public education for all of Hawaii's children and adults. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
Title
Proposing Amendments To Articles Viii And X Of The Constitution Of The State Of Hawaii To Authorize The Legislature To Establish A Surcharge On Residential Investment Property To Increase Funding For Public Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kong, Pierick, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3). |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 384-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-02-08 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Souza; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Evslin, Holt; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kong; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Miyake. |
2024-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-08-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kong, Pierick, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Kapela, Nakashima excused (4). |
2024-02-05 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 41-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2024-01-30 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, M. Mizuno, Perruso, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Garcia; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Quinlan. |
2024-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 01-30-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to EDN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-12 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2056 (Same As) 2024-01-18 - Referred to EDU/HRE, JDC/WAM.