HI SB2045 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "employer" in chapter 388, HRS, to include the State and counties when a provision in that chapter has no comparable provision in chapter 78, HRS.
Title
Relating To Employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee on LBR deferred the measure. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-18 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to LBR/PSM. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1868 (Same As) 2018-01-22 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2045&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2045_.HTM |