HI SB2030 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression
Action: 2016-03-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies that certain types of dissemination, distribution, republication, and use of campaign materials or the financing of which by any person is not a coordinated activity and shall not be considered a contribution to a candidate. (SB2030 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign Expenditures; Coordinated Activity; Dissemination; Distribution; Republication; Campaign Material

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-18HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4).
2016-03-18HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1093-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2016-03-15HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, Thielen.
2016-03-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-15-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2016-03-10HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26
2016-03-10HousePass First Reading
2016-03-08HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 94) in amended form (SD 1).
2016-03-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House.
2016-03-04SenateDeferred until 03-08-16.
2016-03-03SenateOne Day Notice 03-04-16.
2016-03-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2509) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2016-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Galuteria, Harimoto.
2016-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-11-16 9:30AM in conference room 211.
2016-01-29SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2016-01-29SenateReported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2003) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2016-01-26SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele.
2016-01-22SenateThe committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-26-16 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2016-01-20SenateReferred to JDL, WAM.
2016-01-20SenateIntroduced and passed First Reading.
2016-01-15SenatePending Introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1551 (Same As) 2016-02-18 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3).

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback