HI SB2023 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-17 - Referred to HHS, CPN/JDC.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-17 - Referred to HHS, CPN/JDC.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning on January 1, 2025, permits manufacturers of investigational drugs or biological products to make these drugs and products available to terminally ill patients under certain conditions.
Title
Relating To Access To Treatment For Terminally Ill Patients.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Tim Richards [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-17 | Senate | Referred to HHS, CPN/JDC. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2024 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2023&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2023_.HTM |