HI SB2022 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-13 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-13 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that all child support payments go directly to an adult child if the adult child is presently enrolled as a full-time student in, or has been accepted into and plans to attend as a full-time student for the next semester, a post-high school university, college, or vocational school.
Title
Child Support; Adult Child; College
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-13 | Senate | The committee on HMS deferred the measure. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-14 1:15PM in conference room 16. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS, JDL. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Referred to HMS/HRE, JDL. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Introduced. |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1505 (Same As) 2014-01-31 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Hanohano, Jordan, Morikawa, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2022&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB2022_.HTM |