HI SB202 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB202
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-23 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-23 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the service of the commission's preliminary determination of probable cause via first-class mail.
Title
Relating To Preliminary Determination Of Probable Cause.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB202 (Carry Over) 2023-01-23 - Referred to JDC.
HB97 (Same As) 2023-06-07 - Act 069, 06/07/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1169).
HB97 (Same As) 2023-06-07 - Act 069, 06/07/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1169).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=202&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB202_.HTM |