HI SB2017 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Kong, Sayama excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Kong, Sayama excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires defendants convicted of causing the death of a parent or legal guardian of a minor child or an adult dependent child with disabilities by the operation of a vehicle in a negligent manner while under the influence of drugs or alcohol to make restitution in the form of financial support to each surviving child of the victim. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Financial Support Of A Child After Driving Under The Influence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Kong, Sayama excused (4). |
2024-03-19 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1177-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-03-13 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ganaden; and Excused: none. |
2024-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-13-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 58) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2893) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |