HI SB201 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires domestic and foreign corporations to provide their shareholders with reports of independent expenditures and political contributions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Corporations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04SenateThe committee on CPN deferred the measure.
2021-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2021-01-25SenateReferred to CPN, JDC.
2021-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback