HI SB201 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB201

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires domestic and foreign corporations to provide their shareholders with reports of independent expenditures and political contributions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Corporations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-04SenateThe committee on CPN deferred the measure.
2021-01-25SenateReferred to CPN, JDC.
2021-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB201 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback