HI SB2007 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes a state carbon emissions tax of $6.25 per ton of carbon dioxide equivalent emissions on all aviation fuel. Directs the aviation fuel tax into the airport revenue fund. Implements a tax credit to mitigate the effects of this tax on lower income taxpayers. Effective January 1, 2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To A Carbon Tax On Aviation Fuel.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from AEN/TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2610) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, DeCoite, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-22 3:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Referred to AEN/TRS, WAM. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1639 (Same As) 2022-02-08 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.