HI SB2007 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a property manager of a cooperative housing corporation, planned community association, or condominium to be certified in property management by a nationally recognized body.
Title
Relating To Property Management.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-20 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Subjects
Condominium
Cooperative Housing Corporation
Planned Community Association
Property Management Certification
Property Manager
Cooperative Housing Corporation
Planned Community Association
Property Management Certification
Property Manager
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2007&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2007_.HTM |