HI SB2006 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends rate filing requirements for general casualty and property insurance. Allows general casualty insurance rate filings or property insurance rate filings in which the average rate of increase or decrease is no more than an unspecified per cent to be filed on a use and file basis. Limits insurers filing under this exception to one filing per calendar year. Requires insurers to send written notice of intent to increase rate to existing policyholders.
Title
Insurance; Rate Filings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-09-12 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-12 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-18 | (S) Referred to CPN. | |
2012-01-18 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-18 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2006 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2006_.HTM |