HI SB200 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Act 195, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1323).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Act 195, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1323).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that candidates or other committee representatives as specified who make contributions over a certain amount before an election are required to file a late contribution report only if the candidate is on the ballot in that election. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | House | Act 195, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1323). |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Act 195, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1323). |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-22 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-27-21. |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-22 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 14). |
2021-04-20 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakashima, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559). |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-21 2:45PM; CR 325. |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Nakashima Co-Chairs; LoPresti, Ward. |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 792). |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 790). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Lee, Fevella. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 503). |
2021-04-13 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Ohno excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-09 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1844) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-30 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2021-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-30-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1431) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-03-05 | House | The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Eli, Ichiyama, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Mizuno. |
2021-03-03 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 03-05-21 10:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-03 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-05-21 11:10AM. |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 03-03-21 11:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 13 |
2021-02-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-02-11 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 11). |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-11-21. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 58) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-21 9:30AM in conference room Videoconference. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |