HI SB200 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB200
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the University of Hawaii to fund one or more programs sponsored or organized by a University of Hawaii community college or a four-year campus to expand opportunities for international college experiences for University of Hawaii students. Requires the University of Hawaii to work in collaboration with the department of business, economic development, and tourism and requires a report to be submitted to the legislature.
Title
Relating To International Education Programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from HRE/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 276) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HRE/EET, WAM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1231 (Same As) 2020-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TIA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
SB200 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
SB200 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.