HI SB192 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB192
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Act 012, 05/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1112).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Act 012, 05/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1112).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Deposits moneys received in 2018 pursuant to the Tobacco Master Settlement Agreement into the Emergency and Budget Reserve Fund. Specifies that Tobacco Settlement Special Fund excess moneys shall be used to supplant any losses that result from any discount or reduction taken against regular Master Settlement Agreement payments received by the State between calendar years 2018 and 2022. Authorizes the Director of Finance to transfer excess balances from the Natural Area Reserve Fund into the general fund. Appropriates moneys in fiscal year 2017-2018 to the Department of Defense for disaster and flood relief for the County of Kauai and other areas of the State. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The State Budget.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Senate | Act 012, 05/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1112). |
2018-05-10 | House | Act 012, on 05/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1112). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-04-25 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 840). |
2018-04-25 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Quinlan excused (2). |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, L. Thielen . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Deferred until 04-25-18. |
2018-04-23 | House | Deferred two days 04-25-18. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-23-18. |
2018-04-19 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-23-18. |
2018-04-19 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 1-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 1-18). |
2018-04-18 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Morikawa, Nakamura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 625). |
2018-04-17 | House | House Conferees Added: Representatives Morikawa, Nakamura added as Conferees. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-18 2:15PM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Galuteria. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Cullen, Ward. |
2018-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784). |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 550). |
2018-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Thielen, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ito, Say voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Holt excused (2). |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1941-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Todd, Tupola. |
2018-04-02 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-04-18 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 56) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2654) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-28-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
County of Kauai Flooding and Flooding in Other Areas of the State ($)
Disaster Relief Appropriation
DOD
Hawaii Tobacco Prevention and Control Trust Fund
Natural Area Reserve Fund
State Budget
Tobacco Master Settlement Agreement
Tobacco Settlement Special Fund
University Revenue-Undertakings Fund
Disaster Relief Appropriation
DOD
Hawaii Tobacco Prevention and Control Trust Fund
Natural Area Reserve Fund
State Budget
Tobacco Master Settlement Agreement
Tobacco Settlement Special Fund
University Revenue-Undertakings Fund