HI SB185 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB185
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-25 - Referred to PSM/WTL, JDC.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-25 - Referred to PSM/WTL, JDC.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the statewide traffic code to allow for the chairperson of the BLNR and county chiefs of police to designate state or county employees or contractors to issue citations for traffic violations.
Title
Relating To The Traffic Code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to PSM/WTL, JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB185 (Carry Over) 2021-01-25 - Referred to PSM/WTL, JDC.
HB601 (Same As) 2021-07-01 - Act 128, on 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1230).
HB601 (Same As) 2021-07-01 - Act 128, on 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1230).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=185&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB185_.HTM |