HI HB601 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Act 128, on 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1230).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the statewide traffic code to allow for the county chiefs of police to designate county employees to issue citations for traffic violations. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Traffic Code.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-01HouseAct 128, on 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1230).
2021-07-01SenateAct 128, 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1230).
2021-04-23HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2021-04-23SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 621).
2021-04-22HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and none excused (0).
2021-04-22HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2021-04-22SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 614).
2021-04-20HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-15-21.
2021-04-20SenateReceived notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 578).
2021-04-19HouseHouse Conferee(s) discharged.
2021-04-19SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
2021-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Matayoshi, Branco Co-Chairs; McDermott.
2021-04-16SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558).
2021-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 791).
2021-04-15HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2021-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Rhoads, Taniguchi Co-Chairs.
2021-04-13HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 696) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-04-13SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella, Kim, San Buenaventura. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-04-09Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21.
2021-04-09SenateReported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1609) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2021-04-06SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Moriwaki.
2021-04-06SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Kim ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-21 9:55AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-03-23SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
2021-03-23SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1059) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM.
2021-03-16SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere.
2021-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
2021-03-11SenateReferred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
2021-03-11SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-03-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 237).
2021-03-09HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-03-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 944), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-03-02HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-26HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-19HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
2021-02-19HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 516) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2021-02-10HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-10-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-05HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi excused (1).
2021-02-05HouseReported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 27) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-02HouseThe committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno, McDermott.
2021-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-02-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB185 (Same As) 2021-01-25 - Referred to PSM/WTL, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback