HI SB183 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB183
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-25 - Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-25 - Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a framework for the regulation of electric foot scooters by the State and counties. Amends definitions of "moped" to exclude electric foot scooters.
Title
Relating To Electric Foot Scooters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB183 (Carry Over) 2021-01-25 - Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC/WAM.
HB72 (Same As) 2021-07-02 - Act 174, 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1276).
HB72 (Same As) 2021-07-02 - Act 174, 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1276).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=183&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB183_.HTM |