HI SB18 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB18

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an empty homes conveyance tax against certain residential property owners who own a vacant residential unit in the State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Taxation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-04SenateThe committee on JDC deferred the measure.
2021-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 9:15AM in conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-22SenateReferred to JDC, WAM.
2021-01-21SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-21SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB18 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback