HI SB173 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB173
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to CPH/PSM, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to CPH/PSM, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that an adequate supply of medical marijuana authorized for possession by a qualifying patient and the primary caregiver includes seven marijuana plants that are at least twelve inches in height or width, and seven marijuana seedlings that are less than twelve inches in height and width. Authorizes primary caregivers to continue cultivating marijuana for qualifying patients until December 31, 2020. Defines edible cannabis products as manufactured cannabis that is intended to be used, in whole or in part, for human consumption and provides manufacturing requirements for edible cannabis products. Authorizes licensed medical marijuana dispensaries to manufacture and distribute edible cannabis products beginning July 1, 2018. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Medical Marijuana.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from CPH/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 324) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/PSM added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-09-17 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/PSM, JDL/WAM. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to CPH/PSM, JDL. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB173 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.