HI SB17 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB17
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires tour aircraft operations permit applicants to have aircraft that are outfitted with FAA approved safety devices. Prohibits tour aircraft permit holders from allowing the noise footprint of their aircraft to enter any occupied property. Requires denial of permit or rescission of permit if requirements are not met.
Title
Relating To Tour Aircraft.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee on TRS deferred the measure. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 02-11-21 3:01PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 3:05PM in conference room 224. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB17 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=17&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB17_.HTM |