HI SB17 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB17
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to PSM/TRE, JDC.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to PSM/TRE, JDC.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes, for cases of marijuana, a minimum blood concentration content of tetrahydrocannabinol for the offense of driving under the influence of intoxicants.
Title
Relating To The Use Of Intoxicants While Operating A Vehicle.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM/TRE, JDC. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TRE, JDL. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB17 (Carry Over) 2017-01-20 - Referred to PSM/TRE, JDL.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=17&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB17_.HTM |